RI H5674 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defines service contracts and clarifies that service contracts are not insurance and not otherwise subject to the insurance code.
Title
Service Contracts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2019) |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2019-06-05 | House | House read and passed |
2019-05-31 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/05/2019) |
2019-05-28 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2019) |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |