RI H5667 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-24 - Meeting postponed (05/24/2017)
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-24 - Meeting postponed (05/24/2017)
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires movie theaters to provide open captioning for persons who are deaf or hard-of-hearing.
Title
Equal Rights Of Blind And Deaf Persons To Public Facilities
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] |
Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | House | Meeting postponed (05/24/2017) |
2017-05-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2017-03-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2017) |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5667.pdf |