RI H5667 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases to 15 the membership of the Rhode Island Energy Efficiency and Resource Management Council.
Title
Relating To State Affairs And Government
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-06-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/17/2015) |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/10/2015) |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
2015-05-28 | House | House read and passed |
2015-05-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/28/2015) |
2015-05-21 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2015-05-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/21/2015) |
2015-03-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2015) |
2015-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |