RI H5667 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Health And Safety - Division Of Fire Safety
Title
An Act Relating To Health And Safety - Division Of Fire Safety
Sponsors
Rep. Nicholas Mattiello [D] | Rep. Agostinho Silva [D] | Rep. Scott Guthrie [D] | Rep. Lisa Tomasso [D] |
Rep. Stephen Casey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-08 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-03 | Senate | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (07/03/2013) |
2013-07-03 | House | Senate passed Sub A |
2013-07-03 | House | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/03/2013) |
2013-06-25 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2013) |
2013-05-30 | House | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-05-29 | House | House read and passed |
2013-05-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/29/2013) |
2013-05-21 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2013-05-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/21/2013) |
2013-05-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2013) |
2013-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5667.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5667A.pdf |