RI H5665 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the commissioner of elementary and secondary education to adopt a course of study on the nation's founding and related documents, including the Declaration of Independence, the United States Constitution, and the Federalist Papers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civic Literacy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-04-20HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2017)
2017-03-17HouseMeeting postponed (03/22/2017)
2017-03-17HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2017-03-01HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback