RI H5650 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Holocaust and genocide education commission.
Title
Rhode Island Holocaust And Genocide Education Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education |
2021-05-18 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/18/2021) |
2021-05-12 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-05-10 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-05-07 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/12/2021) |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2021) |
2021-02-23 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |