RI H5650 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the imposition of life without parole to persons under the age of eighteen (18) at the time an offense is committed.
Title
Sentencing To Life Imprisonment Without Parole
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/11/2015) |
2015-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5650.pdf |