RI H5648 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Now allows for a summary of a patient's mammography report be provided to the patient by mail, electronically, or otherwise.
Title
Breast Cancer Patient Notification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-08 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/08/2021) |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/27/2021) |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2021-05-19 | House | House read and passed |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/19/2021) |
2021-05-12 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-05-07 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/12/2021) |
2021-03-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2021) |
2021-02-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |