RI H5647 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a surtax on the business corporation tax for publicly traded corporations subject to SEC disclosure and reporting requirements, if corporation's ratio of compensation for its CEO to median worker is equal to or greater than 100 to 1.
Title
Relating To Taxation
Sponsors
Rep. David Morales [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] | Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] | Rep. Brianna Henries [D] |
Rep. John Lombardi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/06/2021) |
2021-02-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5647.pdf |