RI H5640 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-28 - Referred to Senate Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-28 - Referred to Senate Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Places an energy efficiency charge cap on the 2018 state energy efficiency program plan and require the office of energy resources to conduct a study to verify the energy savings measures from the state energy efficiency programs.
Title
Public Utilities Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2017-06-27 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-06-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-26 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-03-21 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2017) |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |