RI H5631 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend several chapters regarding the operation of bikes on state highways and interaction with motor vehicles, aggressive honking, regulation of E-bikes, reckless driver accountability program & speed limits in thickly settled areas/business districts.
Title
Highway Safety Act
Sponsors
Rep. Rebecca Kislak [D] | Rep. June Speakman [D] | Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] |
Rep. Liana Cassar [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2021) |
2021-02-19 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5631.pdf |