RI H5631 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a system of consumer protection for regulation by DBR of noninsurance business entities in disclosing personal identifiable financial information for insurance sales.
Title
Insurance Consumer Protection Sales Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2017) |
2017-03-25 | House | Meeting postponed (03/28/2017) |
2017-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5631.pdf |