RI H5631 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates the bond requirements in civil forfeiture cases, and allows a petitioner to request that the court determine if a forfeiture is disproportionately excessive, and may be reduced or eliminated as it deems appropriate.
Title
Uniform Controlled Substances Act
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Newberry [R] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/31/2015) |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5631.pdf |