RI H5630 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limits copays, coinsurance or office deductible for services of a physical therapist to the amount authorized for medical and osteopathic physician office visits.
Title
Physical Therapy Copay
Sponsors
Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Jeremiah O'Grady [D] |
Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2017) |
2017-03-25 | House | Meeting postponed (03/28/2017) |
2017-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5630.pdf |