RI H5629 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes an emergency telephone system call review and quality improvement and would require at least one 911 system operator trained in telecommunicator cardiopulmonary resuscitation be on duty at all time.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

911 Emergency Telephone Number Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-19 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-23HouseSigned by Governor
2021-06-23HouseTransmitted to Governor
2021-06-22SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2021-06-17SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/22/2021)
2021-06-03SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2021-05-28SenateScheduled for consideration (06/03/2021)
2021-05-20SenateReferred to Senate Health and Human Services
2021-05-19HouseHouse read and passed
2021-05-14HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/19/2021)
2021-05-12HouseCommittee recommends passage
2021-05-07HouseScheduled for consideration (05/12/2021)
2021-03-30HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-03-26HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2021)
2021-02-19HouseIntroduced, referred to House Health & Human Services

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback