RI H5628 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a universal, comprehensive, affordable single-payer health care insurance program which shall be referred to as, "the Rhode Island Comprehensive Health Insurance Program" (RICHIP)
Title
Comprehensive Health Insurance Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/13/2021) |
2021-02-19 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5628.pdf |