RI H5628 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-29 - Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-29 - Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that the department of business regulation provide a mandatory disclosure notice, at no cost to insurers, to certain policy holders regarding their rights and alternatives to lapse or surrender.
Title
Life Insurance
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] |
Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2017-06-27 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-06-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2017) |
2017-03-31 | House | Meeting postponed (04/04/2017) |
2017-03-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-03-25 | House | Meeting postponed (03/28/2017) |
2017-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |