RI H5622 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Meeting postponed (03/14/2017)
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Meeting postponed (03/14/2017)
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that all transfers of a mortgage interest on residential property be recorded so as to provide a clean chain of title for consumers to track the owner of their mortgage loans.
Title
Forms And Effect Of Conveyances
Sponsors
Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | House | Meeting postponed (03/14/2017) |
2017-03-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5622.pdf |