RI H5620 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/04/2021)
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/04/2021)
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the authorized holdings of Jewish Seniors Agency of Rhode Island to two million dollars ($2,000,000) and exempt the same from taxation.
Title
Relating To Jewish Seniors Agency Of Rhode Island
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/04/2021) |
2021-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5620.pdf |