RI H5619 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Distinguishes real estate agents' duties regarding establishing property values from the duties of professional appraisers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real Estate Brokers And Salespersons

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-26 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-06SenateEffective without Governor's signature
2017-06-28SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-06-26HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2017-06-24HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/26/2017)
2017-06-15HouseReferred to House Corporations
2017-06-14SenateSenate passed Sub A
2017-06-13SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/14/2017)
2017-06-06SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2017-06-02SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2017)
2017-05-30SenateReferred to Senate Commerce
2017-04-05HouseHouse read and passed
2017-04-04HousePlaced on House Calendar (04/05/2017)
2017-03-28HouseCommittee recommends passage
2017-03-24HouseScheduled for consideration (03/28/2017)
2017-03-15HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-03-13HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2017)
2017-03-13HouseMeeting postponed (03/14/2017)
2017-03-10HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2017-03-01HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback