RI H5614 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study Ballot Integrity And Security (creates A 5 Member Study Commission To Study Ballot Integrity And Security, And Who Would Report Back To The House By March 3, 2016, And Would Expire On June 3, 2016.)
Title
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study Ballot Integrity And Security (creates A 5 Member Study Commission To Study Ballot Integrity And Security, And Who Would Report Back To The House By March 3, 2016, And Would Expire On June 3, 2016.)
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Newberry [R] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Michael Marcello [D] | Rep. Daniel Reilly [R] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/25/2015) |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5614.pdf |