RI H5612 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-14 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-14 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Scituate-foster Little League
Title
To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Scituate-foster Little League
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-14 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-04-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/06/2017) |
2017-03-23 | House | House read and passed |
2017-03-17 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/23/2017) |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-03-13 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/15/2017) |
2017-03-13 | House | Meeting postponed (03/14/2017) |
2017-03-10 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2017) |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |