RI H5608 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Rhode Island titled vehicles to be allowed to be registered online by the division of motor vehicles. Further, this allows all vehicles purchased from a Rhode Island car dealer to be registered online.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2021) |
2021-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5608.pdf |