RI H5604 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Rhode Island residents who work for an out-of-state nongovernmental employer to apply for coverage under Rhode Island's Temporary Disability Insurance program.
Title
Temporary Disability Insurance - Coverage
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/06/2017) |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5604.pdf |