RI H5599 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the offering or renting of accessory dwelling units for tourist or transient use or through a hosting platform, and enables municipalities to fine property owners and hosting platforms a fine not to exceed five hundred dollars ($500).
Title
Zoning Ordinances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2023) |
2023-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5599.pdf |