RI H5599 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the life appropriations act prohibiting public dollars from the state of Rhode Island to be awarded to any entity that performs convenience abortions.
Title
The Life Appropriations Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2019) |
2019-05-13 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/15/2019) |
2019-05-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5599.pdf |