RI H5597 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Animals And Animal Husbandry -- Biological Products (would Make A Number Of Technical And Definitional Changes Regarding The Provisions Of The General Laws Governing Veterinary Biologics, And Increase The Penalty For Violations)
Title
An Act Relating To Animals And Animal Husbandry -- Biological Products (would Make A Number Of Technical And Definitional Changes Regarding The Provisions Of The General Laws Governing Veterinary Biologics, And Increase The Penalty For Violations)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-01 | House | House passed Sub B in concurrence |
2013-07-01 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/01/2013) |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/25/2013) |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2013-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2013) |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
2013-05-09 | House | House passed Sub A |
2013-05-02 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/09/2013) |
2013-04-30 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-04-26 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2013) |
2013-03-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2013) |
2013-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |