RI H5591 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Eliminates repealed statute references and create a mechanism for employees to enforce their existing right to continuation of medical benefits and annual report by DLT.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Payment Of Wages

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-22HouseSigned by Governor
2023-06-19HouseTransmitted to Governor
2023-06-15SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2023-06-15SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023)
2023-06-13HouseHouse passed Sub A
2023-06-12HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/13/2023)
2023-06-12HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2023-06-09HouseProposed Substitute
2023-06-09HouseScheduled for consideration (06/12/2023)
2023-03-29HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-03-24HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2023)
2023-02-15HouseIntroduced, referred to House Labor

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback