RI H5590 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Commencing 1/1/24, gradually increases the minimum wage for employees receiving gratuities from the current ($3.89) to ($14.95) by 1/1/28 and on 1/1/29 the minimum wage shall be no less than the minimum wage established by the minimum wage law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minimum Wages

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-29HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-03-24HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2023)
2023-02-15HouseIntroduced, referred to House Labor

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback