RI H5589 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-28 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/29/2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Raises the minimum wage for the years 2025, 2026, 2027, 2028 and 2029, to $15.50, $17.00, $18.50, $20.00, and $21.00, per hour, respectively.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minimum Wages

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-28HouseWithdrawn at sponsor's request (03/29/2023)
2023-03-24HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2023-02-15HouseIntroduced, referred to House Labor

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback