RI H5589 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the E-Verify act requiring all government and non-government RI employers with three (3) or more employees to apply/participate in the federal program if accepted.
Title
Relating To Labor And Labor Relations
Sponsors
Rep. Antonio Giarrusso [R] | Rep. Robert Lancia [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. John Carnevale [D] |
Rep. Jared Nunes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2015) |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5589.pdf |