RI H5587 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sets the minimum wage for public school crossing guards at eighteen dollars ($18.00) per hour and also defines a crossing guard as a person who safely assists school students to cross the street.
Title
Minimum Wages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2023) |
2023-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5587.pdf |