RI H5584 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits an employer from inquiring about a prospective employee wage and salary history before an offer of employment with compensation has been negotiated.
Title
Unlawful Employment Practices
Sponsors
Rep. Ramon Perez [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/17/2021) |
2021-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5584.pdf |