RI H5579 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the executive office of health and human services to adjust the per diem reimbursement rate to nursing facilities every 3 years; and provides that any time state minimum wage is increased, the reimbursement rate increases by the same percentage.
Title
Medical Assistance
Sponsors
Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/14/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5579.pdf |