RI H5578 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Businesses And Professions -- Real Estate Brokers And Salespersons
Title
An Act Relating To Businesses And Professions -- Real Estate Brokers And Salespersons
Sponsors
Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] | Rep. Leo Medina [D] | Rep. Jared Nunes [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] |
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-27 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-06-21 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-06-16 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2011-06-15 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar | |
2011-06-07 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence | |
2011-06-07 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-05-31 | Referred to Senate Corporations | |
2011-05-26 | House passed Sub A | |
2011-05-17 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-05-17 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2011-05-17 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-05-10 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-05-10 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-04-12 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-04-12 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-03 | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/HouseText11/H5578.pdf |