RI H5575 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Names the new center for Chemical and Forensic Sciences at the University of Rhode Island the "The Richard E. Beaupre Center for Chemical and Forensic Sciences."
Title
Joint Committee On Naming New Buildings
Sponsors
Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] |
Rep. Donald Lally [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-05-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/20/2015) |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/29/2015) |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
2015-04-16 | House | House read and passed |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/16/2015) |
2015-04-01 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2015-03-27 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/01/2015) |
2015-03-18 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/18/2015) |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |