RI H5575 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the Rhode Island office of energy resources, in consultation with the building commission to promulgate rules and regulations to create a statewide solar photovoltaic permit application.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Statewide Municipal Solar Permit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-18 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-19HouseSigned by Governor
2017-06-14HouseTransmitted to Governor
2017-06-14SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2017-06-13SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/14/2017)
2017-06-07SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2017-06-02SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/07/2017)
2017-05-30SenateReferred to Senate Environment and Agriculture
2017-05-18HouseHouse read and passed
2017-05-12HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/18/2017)
2017-05-10HouseCommittee recommends passage
2017-05-08HouseScheduled for consideration (05/10/2017)
2017-03-09HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-03-03HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2017)
2017-02-16HouseIntroduced, referred to House Municipal Government

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback