RI H5572 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Transmitted to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Updates the laws relating to physician assistants to reflect current standards and terminology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physician Assistants

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11HouseTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-28SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2019-06-28SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/28/2019)
2019-06-04SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2019-05-31SenateScheduled for consideration (06/04/2019)
2019-05-22SenateReferred to Senate Health and Human Services
2019-05-02HouseHouse read and passed
2019-04-26HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/02/2019)
2019-04-10HouseCommittee recommends passage
2019-04-05HouseScheduled for consideration (04/10/2019)
2019-03-27HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-22HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2019)
2019-02-27HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback