RI H5572 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates the need for a special election to create an opt-out municipal energy aggregation plan initiated by any city or town subject to public utility commission approval.
Title
Regulatory Powers Of Administration
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] |
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2017) |
2017-03-13 | House | Meeting postponed (03/15/2017) |
2017-03-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-03-13 | House | Meeting postponed (03/14/2017) |
2017-03-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-02-20 | House | Committee transferred to House Corporations |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5572.pdf |