RI H5571 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Names the roundabout at the intersection of Division Road and New England Tech Boulevard in East Greenwich the "Michael B. Isaacs Roundabout".
Title
Permanent Joint Committee On Naming All New Buildings, Bridges, Edifices And Other State Constructions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-07-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-28 | House | House read and passed |
2017-06-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2017) |
2017-03-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/02/2017) |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |