RI H5570 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a special license plate for the Rocky Point Foundation, Inc., and would specify the fees and other conditions for issuance.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles -- Special Plate For Rocky Point Foundation
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-25 | House | House read and passed |
2015-06-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2015) |
2015-06-22 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2015-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2015) |
2015-05-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/14/2015) |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |