RI H5564 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes private savings (ABLE) account for qualifying disabled persons wherein monies grow tax free and used for qualifying expenses per Section 529A of Internal Revenue Service Code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Able Accounts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-24 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-09HouseSigned by Governor
2015-07-07HouseTransmitted to Governor
2015-06-25SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2015-06-25SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/25/2015)
2015-06-24HouseHouse passed Sub A
2015-06-24HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/24/2015)
2015-06-24HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2015-06-24HouseScheduled for consideration (06/24/2015)
2015-05-26HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2015-05-22HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/26/2015)
2015-02-25HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback