RI H5559 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-12 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the sale or offer for sale in this state of any cosmetic that was developed or manufactured using cosmetic testing on animals, if the testing was conducted or contracted by the manufacturer or any supplier on or after July 1, 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cruelty To Animals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-12 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-12SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2023-06-12HouseHouse passed Sub A
2023-06-09HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/12/2023)
2023-06-08HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2023-06-06HouseProposed Substitute
2023-06-06HouseScheduled for consideration (06/08/2023)
2023-04-04HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-03-31HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2023)
2023-02-15HouseIntroduced, referred to House Health & Human Services

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback