RI H5558 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-09 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-09 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the trapping and subsequent release of any unowned feral or free roaming cat for the purpose of spaying or neutering of the cat would not be considered abandonment.
Title
Cruelty To Animals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2023-06-07 | House | House read and passed |
2023-06-02 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/07/2023) |
2023-05-25 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2023-05-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/25/2023) |
2023-04-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2023) |
2023-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |