RI H5556 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides a six thousand dollar ($6,000) state funded exemption to the motor vehicle excise tax for residents of distressed communities beginning in fiscal year 2017.
Title
Motor Vehicle Tax Elimination
Sponsors
Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] | Rep. David Coughlin [D] |
Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/14/2015) |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5556.pdf |