RI H5555 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-15 - Referred to Senate Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-15 - Referred to Senate Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds a new section which sets forth conditions for pharmacists to prescribe tobacco cessation drug therapies.
Title
Pharmacies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2023-03-28 | House | House read and passed |
2023-03-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/28/2023) |
2023-03-15 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2023-03-10 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/15/2023) |
2023-02-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2023) |
2023-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |