RI H5551 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Bans the sale of cosmetics developed/manufactured using animal testing. A violation would be a $1,000 fine for each offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cruelty To Animals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-16HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-03-12HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/16/2021)
2021-02-12HouseIntroduced, referred to House Health & Human Services

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback