RI H5549 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes persons with misdemeanor or felony convictions eligible for expungement of convictions, provided they had no violent felony, or multiple domestic violence convictions. Eligibility 10 – 20 years respectively from completion of last sentence.
Title
Identification And Apprehension Of Criminals
Sponsors
Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] |
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2017) |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5549.pdf |