RI H5549 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government - Department Of Administration (would Add Three (3) Members To The State Planning Council)
Title
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government - Department Of Administration (would Add Three (3) Members To The State Planning Council)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/01/2013) |
2013-06-28 | House | House passed Sub A |
2013-06-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2013) |
2013-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-06-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/28/2013) |
2013-06-26 | House | Meeting postponed (06/26/2013) |
2013-06-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2013-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5549.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5549A.pdf |