RI H5548 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulates the manufacture, distribution and retail sale of vapor products in Rhode Island.
Title
Department Of Health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2021) |
2021-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5548.pdf |